Global patent index - EP 1006326 A1

EP 1006326 A1 2000-06-07 - Process and apparatus for the production of pressurised oxygen and krypton/xenon by cryogenic air separation

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for the production of pressurised oxygen and krypton/xenon by cryogenic air separation

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Gewinnung von Drucksauerstoff und Krypton/Xenon durch Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la production d'oxygène sous pression et de krypton/xenon par séparation cryogénique d'air

Publication

EP 1006326 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102628 A

Priority

DE 19855487 A

Abstract (en)

Process for recovering pressurized oxygen and krypton/xenon comprises low temperature decomposition of air in a rectification system consisting of a low pressure column (3) for nitrogen-oxygen separation and a krypton-xenon enriching column (15). Process for recovering pressurized oxygen and krypton/xenon comprises low temperature decomposition of air in a rectification system consisting of a low pressure column (3) for nitrogen-oxygen separation and a krypton-xenon enriching column (15). Pressurized pre-cleaned process air (4, 21-23) is fed into the rectification system. A first oxygen fraction (11) is removed from the low pressure column, placed under pressure using a pump (12), vaporized and removed as gaseous pressurized oxygen product (24). A second oxygen fraction (16) is removed from the low pressure column and fed via line (18) to the lower or middle region of the krypton-xenon enriching column. The first oxygen fraction (11) is removed above the sump of the low pressure column and fed via line (14) to the upper region of the krypton-xenon enriching column. A krypton- and/or xenon-enriched fraction is removed from the lower region of the krypton-xenon enriching column. The gaseous pressurized oxygen product (24) is removed from the top of the krypton-xenon enriching column.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren und die Vorrichtung dienen zur Gewinnung von Drucksauerstoff und Krypton/Xenon durch Tieftemperaturzerlegung von Luft. Das Rektifiziersystem weist eine Niederdrucksäule (3) zur Stickstoff-Sauerstoff-Trennung und eine Krypton-Xenon-Anreicherungssäule (15) auf. Verdichtete und vorgereinigte Einsatzluft (4) wird in das Rektifiziersystem eingeleitet. Eine erste Sauerstofffraktion (11) wird der Niederdrucksäule (3) entnommen, flüssig auf einen erhöhten Druck gebracht (12), verdampft und als gasförmiges Drucksauerstoffprodukt (24) abgeführt. Ferner wird eine zweite Sauerstofffraktion (16) der Niederdrucksäule (3) entnommen und in den unteren oder mittleren Bereich der Krypton-Xenon-Anreicherungssäule (15) geleitet (18). Die erste Sauerstofffraktion (11) wird mindestens einen praktischen oder theoretischen Boden oberhalb des Sumpfs der Niederdrucksäule (3) entnommen und nach der Druckerhöhung (12) im flüssigen Zustand in den oberen Bereich der Krypton-Xenon-Anreicherungssäule (15) eingeführt (14). Dem unteren Bereich der Krypton-Xenon-Anreicherungssäule (15) wird eine krypton- und/oder xenonangereicherte Fraktion (19) entnommen. Das Drucksauerstoffprodukt (24) wird gasförmig aus dem oberen Bereich der Krypton-Xenon-Anreicherungssäule (15) abgezogen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25J 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25J 3/04412 (2013.01); F25J 3/04745 (2013.01); F25J 2200/34 (2013.01); F25J 2200/92 (2013.01); F25J 2200/94 (2013.01); F25J 2235/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006326 A1 20000607; EP 1006326 B1 20040421; CN 1123754 C 20031008; CN 1255620 A 20000607; DE 19855487 A1 20000608; DE 59909230 D1 20040527; DK 1006326 T3 20040809; ES 2219942 T3 20041201; JP 2000180050 A 20000630; KR 100660243 B1 20061220; KR 20000047816 A 20000725; US 6301929 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090212

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090212

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090212

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-11-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091030

2009-11-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20090901

2009-10-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090211

2009-10-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2009-10-13 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060208

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-03 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080207

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080214

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080206

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080226

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080203

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080324

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060207

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070518

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070327

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070208

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-07 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070207

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070206

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-04 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070204

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060220

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050124

2004-12-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2219942

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-08-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040729

2004-08-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-08-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-05-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59909230

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-05-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2004-04-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020607

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FI FR GB IT NL SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI