Global Patent Index - EP 1006327 A2

EP 1006327 A2 2000-06-07 - Drying of fibrous web

Title (en)

Drying of fibrous web

Title (de)

Faserstoffbahntrocknung

Title (fr)

Séchage de bandes fibreuses

Publication

EP 1006327 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121524 A

Priority

DE 19855940 A

Abstract (en)

The appts. to dry a fiber web (1) uses a laser light. Its frequency is set so that the laser beams are better absorbed by water than the other components of the web (1). The intensity of the laser light is controlled in separate zones, across the web (1). The extension of the web zones affected by the laser light can be controlled, at least on the longitudinal line of the web (1). The laser (2) is disconnected on a web (1) break. A number of lasers (2) are deployed across the web (1) width, aligned at the web, and they can be on both sides of the web (1). The machine is shrouded at the laser sites. At least one visible light source (3) is fitted in a row of lasers (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren sowie die dazugehörige Vorrichtung zur Trocknung einer Faserstoffbahn 1, insbesondere einer Papier-, Tissue- oder Kartonbahn. Dies soll im wesentlichen mit einem hohen Wirkungsgrad und einer hohen, zonenweise steuerbaren, übertragbaren Energiedichte verbunden sein. Erreicht wird dies dadurch, daß die Faserstoffbahn (1) Laserstrahlung ausgesetzt wird, deren Frequenz vorzugsweise so eingestellt ist, daß die Laserstrahlung vom Wasser besser als von den anderen Bestandteilen der Faserstoffbahn (1) absorbiert wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 3/28; F26B 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/16 (2006.01); F26B 3/28 (2006.01); F26B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/16 (2013.01); F26B 3/28 (2013.01); F26B 13/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006327 A2 20000607; EP 1006327 A3 20011205; DE 19855940 A1 20000608; US 6675494 B1 20040113

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050803

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040130

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI SE

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020605

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-12-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 26B 3/28 A, 7F 26B 13/00 B, 7D 21F 5/16 B

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI SE

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI