Global Patent Index - EP 1006328 A1

EP 1006328 A1 2000-06-07 - Process for monitoring the progression of drying, and apparatus for carrying out the same

Title (en)

Process for monitoring the progression of drying, and apparatus for carrying out the same

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verfolgung des Trocknungverlaufes und Vorrichtung zu dessen Durchführung

Title (fr)

Procédé de suivi de l'évolution du séchage et dispositif de mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 1006328 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402978 A

Priority

FR 9815138 A

Abstract (en)

The drier has a capacitive sensor (35) measuring relative humidity and receiving alternate air flows from the drier hot air stream and from ambient air. A valve (40) fitted to the sensor unit is alternately opened and closed, allowing the alternate air flows over the sensor. If the moisture level is high enough to generate condensation on the sensor, dry air is delivered over the sensor.

Abstract (fr)

Le sèche-linge de l'invention comporte un tambour (29) relié à un circuit de séchage comprenant un dispositif de chauffage d'air (30), un ventilateur (33) et une sonde de mesure (35). Cette sonde comporte un capteur capacitif d'humidité relative (36) recevant alternativement de l'air de séchage (clapet 40 fermant l'orifice 38) et l'air ambiant (orifice 38 ouvert). Le degré de séchage du linge est ainsi déterminé très précisément. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 21/08; F26B 25/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/08 (2006.01); F26B 25/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/08 (2013.01); F26B 25/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006328 A1 20000607; EP 1006328 B1 20051026; DE 69927909 D1 20051201; DE 69927909 T2 20060720; ES 2251820 T3 20060501; FR 2786556 A1 20000602; FR 2786556 B1 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161110

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-27 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-05-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GROUPE BRANDT, FR

- Effective date: 20160420

2015-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131201

2015-03-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150327

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69927909

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121119

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRANDT INDUSTRIES, RUEIL MALMAISON, FR

- Document: DE 69927909

- Effective date: 20120322

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69927909

- Representative's name: PRINZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120322

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-11-03 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS

- Effective date: 20111021

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: FAGORBRANDT SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20110826

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2251820 T3

2006-02-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-01-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060126

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927909 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDT INDUSTRIES

2002-07-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020529

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI