Global Patent Index - EP 1006335 A1

EP 1006335 A1 2000-06-07 - Device for reducing the velocity of a projectile on its trajectory

Title (en)

Device for reducing the velocity of a projectile on its trajectory

Title (de)

Bremsvorrichtung für die Flugbahngeschwindigkeit eines Geschosses

Title (fr)

Dispositif de freinage en translation d'un projectile sur trajectoire

Publication

EP 1006335 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402751 A

Priority

FR 9815101 A

Abstract (en)

The brake (6) used for modifying a trajectory of a projectile (1) includes arms of two air brakes deployable radially in order to increase an aerodynamic drag of the projectile. Every air brake is a flap (7) swiveling around a pivot (19) along a longitudinal axis (20) of the projectile.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention a pour objet un dispositif de freinage en translation d'un projectile (1) sur sa trajectoire. Ce dispositif comprend au moins deux aérofreins déployables radialement de façon à accroître la traînée aérodynamique du projectile. Il est caractérisé en ce que chaque aérofrein est un volet (7) pivotant autour d'un pivot (19) solidaire du projectile et parallèle à l'axe (20) de celui-ci. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 10/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 10/50 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006335 A1 20000607; EP 1006335 B1 20030723; DE 69909719 D1 20030828; DE 69909719 T2 20040408; FR 2786561 A1 20000602; FR 2786561 B1 20011207; US 6310335 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-07-22 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090625 AND 20090701

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040426

2003-10-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69909719 P 20030828

2003-08-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020328

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000623

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI