Global Patent Index - EP 1006336 A2

EP 1006336 A2 2000-06-07 - Spin stabilised projectile

Title (en)

Spin stabilised projectile

Title (de)

Drallstabilisiertes Artilleriegeschoss

Title (fr)

Projectile stabilisé par rotation

Publication

EP 1006336 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118872 A

Priority

DE 19855535 A

Abstract (en)

The sealing ring (9) is arranged in the ring groove (8) of the guiding belt (2) and is connected positively and/or non-positively to the bullet wall (11). Spin-stabilizing artillery bullet has a metallic guiding band (2) and a plastic sealing ring (9). The guiding band (2) is in the longitudinal axis (3) of the bullet (1).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein drallstabilisiertes Artilleriegeschoß mit einem metallischen Führungsband (2) und einem aus Kunststoff bestehenden Dichtring (9), wobei das Führungsband (2), in Richtung der Längsachse (3) des Geschosses (1) gesehen, mindestens eine Ringnut (8) enthält. Um eine Beschädigung oder Zerstörung bzw. ein Abstreifen des Dichtringes (9) beim Einführen des Geschosses (1) in den Ladungsraum der entsprechenden Waffe sicher zu verhindern, schlägt die Erfindung vor, daß der Dichtring (9) in der Ringnut (8) des Führungsbandes (2) angeordnet und mit der Geschoßwand (11) form- und/oder kraftschlüssig verbunden ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4000167 C2 19940414 - RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006336 A2 20000607; EP 1006336 A3 20001115; EP 1006336 B1 20031203; DE 19855535 A1 20000608; US 6412419 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59907929

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080925

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080924

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080924

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-10-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040117

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59907929

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001021

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI