Global patent index - EP 1006337 A2

EP 1006337 A2 2000-06-07 - Spin stabilised artillery projectile

Title (en)

Spin stabilised artillery projectile

Title (de)

Drallstabilisiertes Artilleriegeschloss

Title (fr)

Projectile d'artillerie stabilisé par rotation

Publication

EP 1006337 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99118930 A

Priority

DE 19855536 A

Abstract (en)

The sealing ring (4) consists of metal and is so formed in a ring groove (5) of the bullet so that the sealing ring (4) can spin free from the bullet. Spin-stabilizing artillery bullet has a metallic guide band (2) for transferring of spin to the bullet and a rear-sided sealing ring (4) which is arranged on the guide band (2).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein drallstabilisiertes Artilleriegeschoß mit einem metallischen Führungsband (2) zur Übertragung des Dralles auf das Geschoß und einem heckseitig von dem Führungsband (2) angeordneten Dichtring (4). Um eine Beschädigung oder Zerstörung bzw. ein Abstreifen des Dichtringes (4) beim Einführen des Geschosses (1) in den Ladungsraum der entsprechenden Waffe sicher zu verhindern, schlägt die Erfindung vor, als Dichtring (4) einen Metallring zu verwenden, welcher derart in einer Ringnut (5) des Geschosses (1) angeordnet ist, daß er sich gegenüber dem Geschoß (1) frei drehen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 14/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 14/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4000167 C2 19940414 - RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006337 A2 20000607; EP 1006337 A3 20001115; EP 1006337 B1 20050824; DE 19855536 A1 20000608; US 6401622 B1 20020611

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060925

2007-06-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060925

2007-05-22 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-04-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070403

2006-09-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060926

2006-08-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060526

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-09-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912462

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050824

2005-09-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050912

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050831

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-08-30 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-08-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2005-08-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-01-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041126

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001021

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI