Global Patent Index - EP 1006404 A1

EP 1006404 A1 2000-06-07 - Non-label printing process for direct thermal imaging materials including an organic silver salt

Title (en)

Non-label printing process for direct thermal imaging materials including an organic silver salt

Title (de)

Non-Label-Druckprozess für direkt thermische Bildaufzeichnungsmaterialien, die ein organisches Silbersalz enthalten

Title (fr)

Procédé d'impression de format supérieur à l'étiquette pour des matériaux d'enregistrement direct thermique d'images comprenant un sel d'argent organique

Publication

EP 1006404 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99204002 A

Priority

  • EP 99204002 A
  • EP 98204017 A

Abstract (en)

A printing process for a substantially light-insensitive thermographic monosheet material having two edges parallel to one another and > 12 cm apart (non-label) for obtaining a desired optical density and a desired colour tone comprising the steps of: selecting a thermographic monosheet material, the selected thermographic monosheet material being a black and white thermographic monosheet material having a support and a thermosensitive element; supplying image data to a processing unit of a thermal printer including a printhead having energizable heating elements arranged in a column C; converting the image data which are not zero into at least one activation pulse per pixel to be printed; energising the heating elements printing-line by printing-line adjacent to the selected substantially light-insensitive thermographic monosheet material thereby producing an image; transporting the imaging material past and adjacent to the printhead in a transport direction with a transport system; characterized in that a heat energy of 50 to 200mJ/mm<2> of heating element surface area is used to form an image dot; the thermosensitive element contains a substantially light-insensitive organic silver salt, a reducing agent therefor in thermal working relationship therewith and a binder; and the thermosensitive element excludes an encapsulated organic silver salt in a heat-responsive microcapsule.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/498; B41J 2/355

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/355 (2006.01); G03C 1/498 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/49881 (2013.01); B41J 2/355 (2013.01); G03C 1/4989 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006404 A1 20000607; EP 1006404 B1 20040414

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101124

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916406

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916406

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101124

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091016

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916406 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030117

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-03-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI