Global Patent Index - EP 1006408 A1

EP 1006408 A1 2000-06-07 - Bleaching bath for photographic black and white material

Title (en)

Bleaching bath for photographic black and white material

Title (de)

Bleichbad für fotografisches Schwarz-Weiss-Material

Title (fr)

Bain de blanchiment pour matériau photographique en noir et blanc

Publication

EP 1006408 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123138 A

Priority

DE 19855330 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19855330C1] Bleach bath for photographic black-and-white silver halide materials, with pH 0.4-4 and permanganate ions as bleach, contains condensed phosphates.

Abstract (de)

Ein Bleichbad für fotografische Schwarz-Weiß-Silberhalogenidmaterialien mit einem pH-Wert von 0,4 bis 4 und Permanganat-Ionen als Bleichmittel, dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß es kondensierte Phosphate enthält, zeichnet sich durch eine hohe Bleichgeschwindigkeit bei gleichzeitiger guter Haltbarkeit der Bleichlösung aus.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 5/44; G03C 5/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/26 (2006.01); G03C 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 5/266 (2013.01); G03C 5/44 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

G03C 5/44 + G03C 2200/44

Citation (search report)

[DA] US 5716767 A 19980210 - WERNICKE UBBO [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19855330 C1 20000413; EP 1006408 A1 20000607; EP 1006408 B1 20020213

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060601

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071119

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071119

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051119

2005-09-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050729

2005-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20041130

2005-04-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050406

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-13 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20040921

2003-10-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031027

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031024

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-03-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900859

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-03-21

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI