Global Patent Index - EP 1006495 A1

EP 1006495 A1 2000-06-07 - Article storage device for vending machine

Title (en)

Article storage device for vending machine

Title (de)

Warenspeichervorrichtung für Verkaufsautomat

Title (fr)

Appareil de stockage d'articles pour distributeur automatique

Publication

EP 1006495 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98122714 A

Priority

EP 98122714 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided an article storage device for a vending machine (2). The article storage device is characterized by an opening/closing device which has the following characterizing features: Left and right transparent opening/closing plates (18) have respective inner end portions mounted in a central portion of an article rack (10) in parallel with each other in a manner such that each of the opening/closing plates (18) can rotate about a vertical axis between a closed position for closing a dispensing opening of a corresponding one of article passages formed in the article rack (10) and an open position for opening the dispensing opening of the corresponding article passage. Each opening/closing plate (18) has a cut-away portion (22) formed at an inner end side thereof. A spring urges the each opening/closing plate (18) toward the open position. A stopper plate (19) is arranged at a central location of the article rack (10) which is close to a front side of the each opening/closing plate (18) in a manner such that the stopper plate (19) extends vertically and is capable of rotating about a horizontal axis extending in a front-rear direction between a holding position for abutting on the opening/closing plates (18) to thereby hold the each opening/closing plate (18) in the closed position and a release position for selectively releasing one of the opening/closing plates (18). A stopper plate-driving mechanism (21) causes the stopper plate (19) to rotate between the holding position and the release position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006495 A1 20000607; EP 1006495 B1 20020821; DE 69807343 D1 20020926; DE 69807343 T2 20030424

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2008-11-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071130

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061108

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030522

2003-08-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-01-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.

2002-09-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807343 20020926

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011203

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI