Global Patent Index - EP 1006497 A1

EP 1006497 A1 2000-06-07 - Article dispensing apparatus for automatic vending machine

Title (en)

Article dispensing apparatus for automatic vending machine

Title (de)

Warenausgabevorrichtung für einen Verkaufautomaten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de distribution d'articles pour distributeur automatique

Publication

EP 1006497 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98122716 A

Priority

  • EP 98122716 A
  • JP 16041097 A

Abstract (en)

An article dispensing apparatus for an automatic vending machine appropriately supports a holder for a next sold article in a simple, compact and inexpensive structure. The article dispensing apparatus has an article rack formed with right and left article passages for containing a large number of articles arranged one after the other, wherein the article passages are partitioned from each other by a partition wall, and each provided with a dispensing port at a front end thereof, a driving shaft extending within the partition wall in a longitudinal direction, an open/close member driven by the driving shaft to open the dispensing port of the article passage when an article is purchased, pushers for pressing articles contained in the associated article passages toward the front, a holder support disposed in the partition wall and having a supporting shaft extending in the vertical direction, and right and left holders pivotably supported by the supporting shaft so as to be pivotally movable between a protruding position at which each of the holders protrudes into a corresponding one of the article passages and a retracting position at which each of the holders retracts from the article passage. A cam is positioned between the right and left holders and integrally formed with the driving shaft for pivotally moving the left and right holders to the protruding position when an article is purchased. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 11/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/16 (2006.01); G07F 11/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[DXA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 098, no. 010 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006497 A1 20000607; JP 3511194 B2 20040329; JP H10334330 A 19981218

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050831

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJI ELECTRIC CO., LTD.

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI