Global patent index - EP 1006499 A2

EP 1006499 A2 2000-06-07 - Pos system, method of controlling the same, and information storage medium

Title (en)

Pos system, method of controlling the same, and information storage medium

Title (de)

Registrierkassensystem, Verfahren zu dessen Steuerung, und Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium

Title (fr)

Sytème de terminaux de vente, méthode pour le contrôle de celui-ci et support d'enregistrement de données

Publication

EP 1006499 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123197 A

Priority

GB 9826707 A

Abstract (en)

The invention provides a POS system including an NC (network computer) serving as a POS terminal, a method of controlling such a POS system, and an information storage medium. The POS system includes a POS terminal, a printer connected to the POS terminal, and a store controller connected to the POS terminal. The POS terminal includes data generation means for generating transaction data, first data transmission means for transmitting the data generated by the transaction data generation means to the printer, and second data transmission means for transmitting the transaction data generated by the data generation means to the store controller. The printer includes first reception means for receiving the transaction data transmitted by the first data transmission means, and first nonvolatile storage means for storing the transaction data received via the first reception means. The store controller includes second reception means for receiving the transaction data transmitted by the second data transmission means, and second nonvolatile storage means for storing the transaction data received via the second reception means. A program for controlling these devices is stored on the information storage medium. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07G 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/12 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2006.01); G06Q 50/00 (2006.01); G07G 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/14 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006499 A2 20000607; EP 1006499 A3 20010627; CN 100338626 C 20070919; CN 1264092 A 20000823; GB 9826707 D0 19990127; HK 1030069 A1 20080215; JP 2000235674 A 20000829

INPADOC legal status

2009-03-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20090204

2007-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070810

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-06-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07G 1/14 A, 7G 06F 11/14 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI