Global Patent Index - EP 1006539 A1

EP 1006539 A1 2000-06-07 - Control and monitoring device for the opening/closing of operating elements

Title (en)

Control and monitoring device for the opening/closing of operating elements

Title (de)

Steuer- und Überwachungseinrichtung für die Öffnung oder die Schliessung eines elektrischen Betätigungselementes

Title (fr)

Dispositif de contrôle et surveillance pour l'ouverture ou la fermeture d'un élément électrique de commande

Publication

EP 1006539 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98204085 A

Priority

EP 98204085 A

Abstract (en)

Control and monitoring device for actuator means for the opening/closing of operating elements, comprising current and voltage measuring means and a processing unit that performs the following functions: determining an optimal current and/or voltage value at which to perform the opening/closing operation; determining, following an operating command and a predictive calculation, a succession of moments in which the current or voltage assumes said optimal value; determining a time window for the opening/closing of said operating elements that contains one of the moments in the succession determined; sending a command to said actuator means on the basis of the time window determined and of the operating times of said electric operating elements; characterised by the fact that said optimal value is determined using an adaptive procedure. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 73/00 (2006.01); H01H 9/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/56 (2013.01); H01H 2009/566 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006539 A1 20000607; EP 1006539 B1 20040908; AT 275755 T 20040915; CN 1251263 C 20060412; CN 1255717 A 20000607; DE 69826134 D1 20041014; DE 69826134 T2 20050929; ES 2229444 T3 20050416; KR 20000047874 A 20000725; TW 527489 B 20030411

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2009-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-07-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2229444 T3

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-01-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040404187

2004-12-08 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69826134 P 20041014

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-09-08 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-09-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040908

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030414

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001122

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI