Global Patent Index - EP 1006540 A2

EP 1006540 A2 2000-06-07 - Switching device

Title (en)

Switching device

Title (de)

Schaltervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commutation

Publication

EP 1006540 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99123699 A

Priority

JP 33892298 A

Abstract (en)

A switching device includes a frame, an AC circuit switch capable of performing ON/OFF operation by holding in a locked or unlocked state a slidable operating member which is disposed inside of a first casing, a DC circuit switch mounted inside of a second casing and capable of performing ON/OFF operation in interlock with the sliding motion of the operating member, and a driving power source capable of sliding the operating member. The AC circuit switch, the DC circuit switch, and the driving power source are mounted as one unit on the frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/04; H01H 13/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/04 (2006.01); H01H 13/56 (2006.01); H01H 13/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0066 (2013.01); H01H 13/04 (2013.01); H01H 13/568 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006540 A2 20000607; EP 1006540 A3 20021106; EP 1006540 B1 20060920; DE 69933268 D1 20061102; DE 69933268 T2 20070405; EP 1667181 A1 20060607; JP 2000164065 A 20000616; JP 3765934 B2 20060412; MY 122448 A 20060429

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091129

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070621

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69933268 P 20061102

2006-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-09-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060920

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021224

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI