Global Patent Index - EP 1006540 A3

EP 1006540 A3 2002-11-06 - Switching device

Title (en)

Switching device

Title (de)

Schaltervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commutation

Publication

EP 1006540 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99123699 A

Priority

JP 33892298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1006540A2] A switching device includes a frame, an AC circuit switch capable of performing ON/OFF operation by holding in a locked or unlocked state a slidable operating member which is disposed inside of a first casing, a DC circuit switch mounted inside of a second casing and capable of performing ON/OFF operation in interlock with the sliding motion of the operating member, and a driving power source capable of sliding the operating member. The AC circuit switch, the DC circuit switch, and the driving power source are mounted as one unit on the frame. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/04; H01H 13/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/00 (2006.01); H01H 13/04 (2006.01); H01H 13/56 (2006.01); H01H 13/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/0066 (2013.01); H01H 13/04 (2013.01); H01H 13/568 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006540 A2 20000607; EP 1006540 A3 20021106; EP 1006540 B1 20060920; DE 69933268 D1 20061102; DE 69933268 T2 20070405; EP 1667181 A1 20060607; JP 2000164065 A 20000616; JP 3765934 B2 20060412; MY 122448 A 20060429

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091129

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070621

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69933268 P 20061102

2006-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2006-09-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060920

2003-07-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021224

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI