Global Patent Index - EP 1006542 A1

EP 1006542 A1 2000-06-07 - Switching device

Title (en)

Switching device

Title (de)

Schaltervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commutation

Publication

EP 1006542 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99124137 A

Priority

JP 34394498 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a switching device comprising a locking member which, by sliding the operating member, is guided by the cam bottom surface to come in contact with the locking wall and retain the operating member in its lock state. The operating member has an extra stroke to slide from the position of said locked state farther in one direction and is retained in its locked state while it is moving back and forth in the extra stroke. Then, the operating member in the extra stroke is slid to turn the second switch on, and when a control circuit of the appliance detects the ON signal a predetermined processing before a shut-off of the power circuit of the equipment can be properly done. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/56 (2006.01); H01H 50/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/568 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] DE 19519181 A1 19951130 - ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006542 A1 20000607; EP 1006542 B1 20040721; CN 1127105 C 20031105; CN 1255720 A 20000607; DE 69918783 D1 20040826; DE 69918783 T2 20050721; JP 2000173396 A 20000623; JP 3765935 B2 20060412; MY 123320 A 20060531

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-09-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69918783

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69918783

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121221

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091202

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091202

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2005-03-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69918783 P 20040826

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-03-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030129

2001-07-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-07-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2001-03-29 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000608

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI