Global Patent Index - EP 1006543 A1

EP 1006543 A1 2000-06-07 - Illuminated membrane electrical switch

Title (en)

Illuminated membrane electrical switch

Title (de)

Beleuchtete Membrane für einen elektrischen Schalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique à membrane illuminée

Publication

EP 1006543 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98122875 A

Priority

EP 98122875 A

Abstract (en)

An illuminated switch (20) includes a resilient actuation layer (22) having at least a light transmissive portion. A flexible illumination layer (26) is disposed below the actuation layer. A spacer layer (28) is disposed below the illumination layer and includes an aperture (28a) in registry with the light transmissive portion of the actuation layer. A contact layer (30) is disposed below the spacer layer and includes a dome portion (30a) having a convex side projecting into the aperture (28a) in the spacer layer (28). A conductive contact (38) is disposed on the concave side of the dome portion (30a) for engaging a switch contact (40) below the contact on the contact layer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 13/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/702 (2013.01); H01H 2219/018 (2013.01); H01H 2219/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006543 A1 20000607; EP 1006543 B1 20050202; DE 69828885 D1 20050310; DE 69828885 T2 20060119

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071202

2008-08-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071202

2007-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070131

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061228

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20061227

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061222

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-03-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69828885 P 20050310

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2005-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040128

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB IT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI