Global Patent Index - EP 1006547 A1

EP 1006547 A1 2000-06-07 - Closing resistor insertion mechanism with ball lock retainer

Title (en)

Closing resistor insertion mechanism with ball lock retainer

Title (de)

Einfügungsmechanismus mit Kugelverriegelung, für Einschaltwiderstand

Title (fr)

Mécanisme d'insertion d'une résistance de fermeture avec un verrouillage à bille

Publication

EP 1006547 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402903 A

Priority

FR 9815035 A

Abstract (en)

The mechanism includes a arc contact capable of partial movement in a direction (A) along which a metal rod (1) bearing a sliding tube (2) extends. Contact fingers (5) are provided at one end which engage a contact (5') so as to short circuit an arc-preventing resistance. A system with at least one ball (24) locks the sliding tube during the first phase of opening, and retracts during the second phase to allow the tube to move in the contact-separating direction.

Abstract (fr)

Le mécanisme d'insertion d'une résistance de fermeture est destiné à un interrupteur comprenant un contact d'arc semi-mobile qui est solidaire d'une tige métallique (1) reliée à la résistance. Il comprend un tube métallique (2) coulissant sur la tige et portant des doigts (5) venant s'embrocher sur une borne (5') de l'interrupteur, un ressort (22) disposé entre un épaulement (12) sur la tige et un épaulement (9) sur le tube de façon à être comprimé lors d'une première phase d'une manoeuvre d'ouverture de l'interrupteur et exercer, lors d'une seconde phase de la manoeuvre d'ouverture de l'interrupteur, une force de rappel sur le tube afin de séparer les doigts de la borne. Ce mécanisme comprend en outre un système avec au moins une bille (24) qui verrouille le tube en déplacement selon ladite direction lors de la première phase d'ouverture et qui s'escamote lors de la seconde phase d'ouverture pour libérer le tube en déplacement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01C 10/50 (2006.01); H01H 33/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/166 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006547 A1 20000607; EP 1006547 B1 20060125; BR 9907398 A 20020723; CA 2290850 A1 20000530; CA 2290850 C 20040608; CN 1135585 C 20040121; CN 1258922 A 20000705; DE 69929580 D1 20060413; DE 69929580 T2 20061109; FR 2786606 A1 20000602; FR 2786606 B1 20010105; JP 2000173413 A 20000623; KR 20000035746 A 20000626; TW 497111 B 20020801; US 6284993 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69929580

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151109

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151105

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D SA, FR

2013-08-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD, CH

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-08-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM GRID SAS, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69929580

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-08-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69929580

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130610

2013-06-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69929580

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2013-01-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D S.A., LEVALLOIS-PERRET, FR

- Document: DE 69929580

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: AREVA T&D S.A., LEVALLOIS-PERRET, FR

- Document: DE 69929580

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-31 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69929580

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20121211

2013-01-04 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20121204

2013-01-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALSTOM GRID SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20121204

2012-12-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69929580

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-08-23 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-04-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060425

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69929580 P 20060413

2006-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-01-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2006-01-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060125

2006-01-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060125

2004-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AREVA T&D SA

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI