Global patent index - EP 1006549 A1

EP 1006549 A1 2000-06-07 - Electromechanical switching apparatus

Title (en)

Electromechanical switching apparatus

Title (de)

Elektromechanisches Schaltgerät

Title (fr)

Appareil interrupteur électromagnétique

Publication

EP 1006549 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402973 A

Priority

FR 9815184 A

Abstract (en)

The contactor has a moving armature (30) attached by snap-fastening using at least one tab made of elastic material to the moving contact set (11, 12) mounted on a carrier (2). The contactor may be assembled by fitting the carrier to the moving armature by snap fastening either directly, or indirectly, by means of an additional intermediate piece.

Abstract (fr)

Appareil interrupteur électromagnétique comprenant un porte-contacts mobile (2) équipé d'un ensemble de ponts de contacts (10) portant des contacts mobiles de puissance (11, 12) coopérant avec des contacts fixes (13, 14) et comprenant un électro-aimant (3) constitué par une bobine (31), une armature fixe (32) et une armature mobile (30), le porte-contacts mobile (2) comprenant des moyens d'assemblage constitués d'au moins une patte élastique (23) pour une fixation par encliquetage de l'armature mobile (30) de l'électro-aimant au porte-contacts mobile (2), caractérisé en ce que ces moyens d'assemblage sont adaptés pour permettre aussi bien un assemblage direct qu'un assemblage indirect de l'armature mobile (30) sur le porte-contacts mobile (2), suivant le type d'armature mobile (30) utilisé dans des électro-aimants à courant continu ou à courant alternatif. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/04; H01H 50/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/045 (2013.01); H01H 50/042 (2013.01); H01H 50/546 (2013.01); H01H 50/545 (2013.01); H01H 2050/046 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006549 A1 20000607; EP 1006549 B1 20061102; DE 69933842 D1 20061214; DE 69933842 T2 20070301; ES 2275333 T3 20070601; UA 61989 C2 20001115; US 6239679 B1 20010529; ZA 200003868 B 20010601

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-05 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151008

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151118

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151016

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151116

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070803

2007-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2275333

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69933842

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-12-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20061122

2006-11-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050705

2002-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRONIC INDUSTRIES SAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991229

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI