Global Patent Index - EP 1006551 A2

EP 1006551 A2 2000-06-07 - Electric lamp

Title (en)

Electric lamp

Title (de)

Elektrische Lampe

Title (fr)

Lampe électrique

Publication

EP 1006551 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99123578 A

Priority

DE 19855412 A

Abstract (en)

The lamp has a base and at least one light arrangement enclosed by a transparent bulb. At least two current wires (12,13) protruding from the bulb supply the light arrangement with voltage. The lamp base has a holder for the bulb in a plastics part (15) and electrical contact vanes (16,17) connected to the wires. Each contact vane has a groove (16c,17c) in which a current wire is welded, for which a through aperture is provided in the base.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Kfz-Scheinwerferlampe mit einem Metall-Kunststoffsockel, dessen elektrische Anschlüsse als Kontaktfahnen (16, 17) ausgebildet sind. Erfindungsgemäß weisen die beiden Kontaktfahnen (16, 17) jeweils eine Nut (16c, 17c) auf, in der jeweils ein aus dem Lampenkolben herausgeführter Stromzuführungsdraht (12, 13) durch eine Schweißverbindung mit der entsprechenden Kontaktfahne (16, 17) fixiert ist. Außerdem sind die Kontaktfahnen (16, 17) mit Mitteln (16f, 17f) zur Einfädelung der Stromzuführungsdrähte (12, 13) in die jeweilige Nut (16c, 17c) ausgestattet und der Lampensockel besitzt wenigstens einen Durchbruch (18), der zur Durchführung der Verschweißung der in den Nuten (16c, 17c) angeordneten Stromzuführungsdrähte (12, 13) mit den Kontaktfahnen (16, 17) dient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 5/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); H01J 5/62 (2006.01); H01K 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01K 1/46 (2013.01); H01J 5/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006551 A2 20000607; EP 1006551 A3 20000614; EP 1006551 B1 20030820; AT 247864 T 20030915; CA 2290837 A1 20000601; CN 1153255 C 20040609; CN 1257302 A 20000621; DE 19855412 A1 20000608; ES 2205686 T3 20040501; HU 222629 B1 20030929; HU 9904394 A2 20000628; HU 9904394 A3 20000828; HU 9904394 D0 20000228; JP 2000173320 A 20000623; JP 4588825 B2 20101201; KR 100621264 B1 20060906; KR 20000047787 A 20000725; TW 442824 B 20010623; US 6244737 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131127

2015-05-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150505

2014-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131126

2014-08-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131127

2014-08-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 247864 T

- Effective date: 20131126

2014-07-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-06-18 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140601

2014-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PATENT-TREUHAND-G.- FUR ELEKTRISCHE GLUHLAMPEN M.

- Effective date: 20131130

2013-10-17 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GMBH, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59906665

- Effective date: 20130822

2013-03-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-03-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM AG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59906665

- Effective date: 20130205

2013-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-19 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: OSRAM GESELLSCHAFT MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, 81543 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59906665

- Effective date: 20111130

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205686 T3

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031205

2003-12-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906665 P 20030925

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01J 5/62 A, 7H 01K 1/46 B

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI