Global patent index - EP 1006554 A1

EP 1006554 A1 2000-06-07 - Improvement to coplanar-type plasma panels

Title (en)

Improvement to coplanar-type plasma panels

Title (de)

Verbesserung an koplanaren Plasma-Anzeigen

Title (fr)

Amélioration aux panneaux à plasma de type coplanaire

Publication

EP 1006554 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99402892 A

Priority

FR 9815056 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a plasma panel comprising a first tile called the rear tile (10) and a second tile called the front tile (20), the two tiles being joined together with a distance of separation defining a space filled with gas, a first array of electrodes which is formed from a set of two parallel electrodes (11, 11'), called the sustaining electrodes, and which is placed on one of the tiles, a second array of electrodes called the addressing electrodes (21) which is placed on the other tile, and an array of barriers (15) which is placed on one of the tiles parallel to the array of addressing electrodes. According to the invention, the array of barriers (15) is positioned on the tile (10) carrying the first array of electrodes (11, 11'), the barriers having a height (H) of less than the distance of separation (E) between the two tiles and the separation (E) between the two tiles is obtained by specific spacing means (16). The invention applies to so-called coplanar plasma panels. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 17/49

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2012.01); H01J 11/32 (2012.01); H01J 11/36 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 11/12 (2013.01); H01J 11/32 (2013.01); H01J 11/36 (2013.01); H01J 2211/326 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] JP H0896714 A 19960412 - NEC CORP & PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 96, no. 8 30 August 1996 (1996-08-30)19960830968JPH0896714A
  • [A] US 4206386 A 19800603 - AKUTSU HIDEZO [JP], et al
  • [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 195 (E - 518) 23 June 1987 (1987-06-23)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 227 (E - 526) 23 July 1987 (1987-07-23)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 09 30 September 1997 (1997-09-30)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 263 (E - 1550) 19 May 1994 (1994-05-19)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006554 A1 20000607; FR 2786607 A1 20000602; FR 2786607 B1 20010105; JP 2000200552 A 20000718; TW 544646 B 20030801

INPADOC legal status

2006-11-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060601

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030711

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI