Global Patent Index - EP 1006605 A1

EP 1006605 A1 2000-06-07 - Hand-held apparatus

Title (en)

Hand-held apparatus

Title (de)

Tragbares Gerät

Title (fr)

Appareil portable

Publication

EP 1006605 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99124720 A

Priority

  • DK 74296 A
  • EP 97929142 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates a hand-held apparatus (11) which comprises at least two transmitter antennas (9, 14) for emitting a radio signal. A first one (14) of at least two transmitter antennas has an omnidirectional radiation characteristic and a second one (9) of the at least two transmitter antennas has a directional characteristic. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 1/24; H01Q 21/29

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 21/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/245 (2013.01); H01Q 1/242 (2013.01); H01Q 1/243 (2013.01); H01Q 21/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] EP 0523867 A2 19930120 - TECHNOPHONE LTD [GB]
  • [XY] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 148 (E - 1522) 11 March 1994 (1994-03-11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9801919 A2 19980115; WO 9801919 A3 19980305; AU 3336397 A 19980202; DE 69713103 D1 20020711; DE 69713103 T2 20030227; DK 176625 B1 20081201; DK 74296 A 19980106; EP 0916166 A2 19990519; EP 0916166 B1 20020605; EP 1006605 A1 20000607; EP 1006605 B1 20130529; EP 1006606 A1 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160720

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-06-12 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Ref Legal Event Code: R097

- Ref Document Number: 69740604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140303

2014-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20140303

2013-08-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2013-07-25 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R096

- Ref Document Number: 69740604

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130725

2013-05-29 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0916166

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2013-05-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2013-05-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2013-05-01 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Ref Legal Event Code: INTG

- Effective date: 20130408

2007-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IPCOM GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020805

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB SE

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001207

2000-06-07 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 916166

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI