Global Patent Index - EP 1006625 A1

EP 1006625 A1 2000-06-07 - Straight/cross connection using double connector

Title (en)

Straight/cross connection using double connector

Title (de)

Direkte/gekreuzte Verbindung mit Verwendung eines doppelten Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connexion directe/croisée utilisant un connecteur double

Publication

EP 1006625 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98309990 A

Priority

EP 98309990 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed a connector arrangement having first and second adjacent connector terminals provided in first and second connector housings, a third connector terminal provided in a third connector housing adjacent the second terminal connected to the first terminal and a fourth connector terminal provided in a fourth connector housing between said second and third connector terminals and connected to the second terminal. Each of said first and third connector terminals comprise a plurality of connection points, respective ones of the plurality of connection points of the first and third connector terminals being connected. Each of said second and fourth connector terminals comprises a plurality of connection points, respective ones of the plurality of connection points of the second and fourth connector terminals being connected. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 27/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 27/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006625 A1 20000607; EP 1006625 B1 20020724; DE 69806766 D1 20020829; DE 69806766 T2 20030306

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161204

2017-08-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69806766

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-11-21 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

- Effective date: 20141015

2014-05-16 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

- Effective date: 20140410

2013-12-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: ALCATEL-LUCENT USA INC.

- Effective date: 20131122

2013-12-18 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131121 AND 20131127

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806766 20020829

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB NL

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI