Global patent index - EP 1006744 A3

EP 1006744 A3 2000-06-21 - Process and terminal for initiating a protected-access transaction and automatic locking of the terminal

Title (en)

Process and terminal for initiating a protected-access transaction and automatic locking of the terminal

Title (de)

Verfahren und Endgerät zum Starten einer zugangsgeschützten Transaktion und automatisches Sperren des Endgeräts

Title (fr)

Procédé et terminal pour l'initiation de transactions à accès protégé et verrouillage automatique du terminal

Publication

EP 1006744 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99402995 A

Priority

FR 9815232 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1006744A2] The invention relates to a process for initiating a protected-access transaction on a telephony network from a telecommunication terminal and the terminal for its implementation. An access data frame comprising an address number for initiating the transaction is entered by the user from the telecommunication terminal. The access data frame entered comprises, for initiating each protected-access transaction, in addition to the address number, an access code. Upon each entry of an access data frame, the access code contained in the access data frame is compared with a predefined code specific to the telecommunication terminal. The transaction is initiated only if the access code contained in the access data frame is identical to the predefined code. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/673 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01); H04W 88/02 (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/673 (2013.01); H04M 1/72519 (2013.01); H04W 12/08 (2013.01); H04W 12/12 (2013.01); H04W 88/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006744 A2 20000607; EP 1006744 A3 20000621; FR 2786971 A1 20000609; FR 2786971 B1 20010216

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021129

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC TELECOM EUROPE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001214

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI