Global Patent Index - EP 1006756 A1

EP 1006756 A1 2000-06-07 - Sensor controlled hot plate with sensor arranged below the plate

Title (en)

Sensor controlled hot plate with sensor arranged below the plate

Title (de)

Sensorgesteuertes Kochfeld mit unterhalb der Kochfeldplatte angeordneter Sensoreinheit

Title (fr)

Régulateur de plaque chauffante à l'aide d'un détecteur situé en dessous de la plaque

Publication

EP 1006756 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99123600 A

Priority

DE 19856140 A

Abstract (en)

The value of the transmission of a cooking plate (3) in a spectral measurement aperture (18) towards the infrared (IR) radiation sensor (19) is smaller than 10% approaching 0%. A reflection-layer (17) is deposited on wall of a measurement hole (15) to increase of sensitivity the measurement. Under a cooking plate (3), a measurement aperture (18) passes the heat radiation towards the IR sensor (19).

Abstract (de)

Bekannt ist ein sensorgesteuertes Kochfeld mit einer Kochfeldplatte, insbesondere aus Glaskeramik, mit zumindest einer Kochzone, die mittels eines unterhalb der Kochfeldplatte angeordneten Heizelementes beheizbar ist, sowie mit einer unterhalb der Kochfeldplatte angeordneten und gegen deren Unterseite im Bereich eines flächenmäßig begrenzten Meßfleckes gerichteten Wärmestrahlungs-Sensoreinheit, die in Verbindung steht mit einer Steuereinheit zur Regelung der Heizleistung des Heizelementes. Um topfunabhängig eine möglichst genaue Heizleistungsregelung zu erreichen, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß der Wert des Transmissionsgrades des Materials der Kochfeldplatte zumindest im Bereich des Meßfleckes zumindest im spektralen Meßbereich der Wärmestrahlungs-Sensoreinheit kleiner als 30 %, vorzugsweise kleiner als 10 % und insbesondere annähernd etwa 0 % ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 6/06; G02B 6/00; H05B 1/02; H05B 3/00; H05B 3/68; H05B 6/08; H05B 6/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/746 (2013.01); H05B 2213/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006756 A1 20000607; EP 1006756 B1 20020605; EP 1006756 B2 20100217; DE 19856140 A1 20000608; ES 2178337 T3 20021216; ES 2178337 T5 20100531; US 6225607 B1 20010501

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59901608

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20150402

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100603

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101126

2010-05-31 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-02-17 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20100217

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-01-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2003-05-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: MIELE & CIE. GMBH & CO.SCHUTZRECHTE/VERTRAE

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178337

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020721

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901608

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001120

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI