Global Patent Index - EP 1006759 A2

EP 1006759 A2 2000-06-07 - System for monitoring a lighting installation or light signaling equipment having a plurality of light points of the led or similar type

Title (en)

System for monitoring a lighting installation or light signaling equipment having a plurality of light points of the led or similar type

Title (de)

Anordnung zur Überwachung einer Beleuchtungseinrichtung oder einer Signalisierungsanordnung mit mehreren Lichtquellen vom LED Typ

Title (fr)

Système de surveillance d'une installation d'éclairage ou d'un dispositif de signalisation utilisant des diodes electroluminescentes comme sources lumineuses

Publication

EP 1006759 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830640 A

Priority

IT FI980264 A

Abstract (en)

The system comprises groups (1, 3, 5) of LEDs, the LEDs of each of the groups being connected in series with each other; a direct current power supply (1B, 3B, 5B) is provided for each series; in a microprocessor (9) each of a plurality of inputs is connected to an intermediate point (1C, 3C, 5C) of one of the series of LEDs, so that an interruption of current in one of the series of LEDs or a short-circuit in one LED causes a change in the voltage at the corresponding input of the microprocessor, and a scanning means is used for monitoring the individual inputs by scanning; at the output of said microprocessor, a detector (12) signals this change, during scanning, by means of a relay (12C). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 33/08; H05B 37/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/08 (2006.01); H05B 37/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 33/0893 (2013.01); H05B 37/036 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1006759 A2 20000607; EP 1006759 A3 20030423; EP 1006759 B1 20050504; DE 69925092 D1 20050609; DE 69925092 T2 20060126; ES 2248977 T3 20060316; IT 1305051 B1 20010410; IT FI980264 A1 20000605; IT FI980264 D0 19981204

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20111021

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051013

2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20051011

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2006-04-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060207

2006-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2248977

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-10-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-10-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051011

2005-10-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051011

2005-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69925092

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-09

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-01 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-05-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-05-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-11-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: REDI, PAOLO

2004-11-24 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LORI, LORENZO

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-01-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030705

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI