Global Patent Index - EP 1006790 A1

EP 1006790 A1 2000-06-14 - USE OF MARINER TRANSPOSON IN THE PRODUCTION OF TRANSGENIC ANIMALS

Title (en)

USE OF MARINER TRANSPOSON IN THE PRODUCTION OF TRANSGENIC ANIMALS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON TRANSPOSON MARINER ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TRANSGENEN TIEREN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DE L'ELEMENT $i(MARINER) POUR CREER DES ANIMAUX TRANSGENIQUES

Publication

EP 1006790 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98939777 A

Priority

  • GB 9802517 W
  • GB 9717913 A
  • GB 9812822 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9909817A1] A method for the preparation of a transgenic animal embryo comprising the step of introducing a mariner-like element (MLE) containing a transgene into an animal embryo cell, optionally including the step of introduction of exogenous transposase protein, or a DNA or RNA sequence encoding a transposase. The resulting embryo may be used to generate further embryos or be allowed to develop into an animal. The invention is useful in introducing foreign DNA into selected animals.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 67/027; C12N 15/90

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/027 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12N 15/873 (2010.01); C12N 15/90 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 67/0275 (2013.01); C12N 15/873 (2013.01); C12N 15/90 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9909817A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9909817 A1 19990304; AU 8817798 A 19990316; CA 2300972 A1 19990304; EP 1006790 A1 20000614; JP 2001513336 A 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1029740

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2004-05-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-08-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030624

2001-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSLIN INSTITUTE (EDINBURGH)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SANG, HELEN, ROSLIN INSTITUTE (EDINBURGH)

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FINNEGAN, DAVID, JOHN, UNIVERSITY OF EDINBURGH

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000316

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE