Global Patent Index - EP 1006801 A4

EP 1006801 A4 2001-05-02 - SERTOLI CELLS AS NEURORECOVERY INDUCING CELLS FOR NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS

Title (en)

SERTOLI CELLS AS NEURORECOVERY INDUCING CELLS FOR NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS

Title (de)

SERTOLI-ZELLEN ALS INDIKATOREN DER NEUROREGENERATION IN NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN

Title (fr)

CELLULES DE SERTOLI UTILISEES COMME CELLULES INDUISANT LA RECUPERATION NEUROLOGIQUE EN CAS DE TROUBLES NEURODEGENERATIFS

Publication

EP 1006801 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96908758 A

Priority

  • US 9603335 W
  • US 40238995 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2215343A1] A method of generating in situ trophic factor production by transplanting Sertoli cells into a tissue in need of trophic factors of a mammal, the cells creating trophic factors in situ.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 35/00; A01N 63/00; C12N 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/06 (2006.01); A01N 63/00 (2006.01); A61K 35/00 (2006.01); A61K 35/48 (2015.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/48 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9206702 A1 19920430 - UNIV NEW YORK [US]
  • [X] SELAWRY H P ET AL: "Production of a factor, or factors, suppressing IL-2 production and T cel proliferation by Sertoli cell-enriched preparations. A potentia role for islet transplantation in an immunologically privileged site.", TRANSPLANTATION, (1991 NOV) 52 (5) 846-50., XP000602288
  • [X] WYATT CR ET AL: "Suppression of lymphocyte proliferation by proteins secreted by cultured Sertoli cells", J REPRODUC IMMUNOL, vol. 14, 1988, pages 27 - 40, XP000983203
  • [X] DE CESARIS P ET AL.: "Immunosuppressive molecules produced by Sertoli cells cultured in vitro: biological effects on lymphocytes", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, vol. 186, no. 3, 14 August 1992 (1992-08-14), pages 1639 - 1646, XP000942038
  • [PX] SANBERG P R ET AL: "SERTOLI CELLS - AN ALTERNATIVE CELL SOURCE FOR NEURAL TRANSPLANTATION IN PARKINSONS-DISEASE", EXPERIMENTAL NEUROLOGY, ( OCT 1995 ) VOL. 135, NO. 2, PP. 169. ISSN: 0014-4886., XP000983205
  • [PX] SANBERG, P. R. (1) ET AL: "Functional recovery in hemiparkinsonian rats following neural transplantation of testis-derived Sertoli cells.", SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE ABSTRACTS, (1995) VOL. 21, NO. 1-3, PP. 317. MEETING INFO.: 25TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY FOR NEUROSCIENCE SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA NOVEMBER 11-16, 1995, XP000983272
  • [PX] ROBERTS K P ET AL: "IMMORTALIZATION AND CHARACTERIZATION OF A SERTOLI CELL LINE FROM THE ADULT RAT", BIOLOGY OF REPRODUCTION,US,SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF REPRODUCTION, CHAMPAIGN, IL, vol. 53, no. 6, 1 December 1995 (1995-12-01), pages 1446 - 1453, XP000602206, ISSN: 0006-3363
  • [T] SANBERG PAUL R ET AL: "Testis-derived Sertoli cells survive and provide localized immunoprotection for xenografts in rat brain.", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, vol. 14, no. 13, 1996, pages 1692 - 1695, XP000942044, ISSN: 1087-0156
  • [T] BORLONGAN CV ET AL: "CNS immunological modulation of neural graft rejection and survival", NEUROLOGICAL RESEARCH, vol. 18, August 1996 (1996-08-01), pages 297 - 304, XP000983230
  • See also references of WO 9628030A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 5189796 A 19961002; AU 705932 B2 19990603; CA 2215343 A1 19960919; CA 2215343 C 20020219; EP 1006801 A1 20000614; EP 1006801 A4 20010502; JP 3699727 B2 20050928; JP H11501818 A 19990216; MX 9707028 A 19980628; NZ 304646 A 19980126; TW 427907 B 20010401

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-05 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021021

2001-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 35/00 A, 7A 01N 63/00 B, 7C 12N 5/06 B

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19971007

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE