Global Patent Index - EP 1006805 A1

EP 1006805 A1 2000-06-14 - DEVICE FOR SEALING A SYSTEM FOR CONDITIONING PRODUCTS ON A PALETTE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR SEALING A SYSTEM FOR CONDITIONING PRODUCTS ON A PALETTE

Title (de)

DICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE KLIMAANLAGE FÜR AUF PALETTEN GESTAPELTE GÜTER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ETANCHEITE D'UN SYSTEME DE CONDITIONNEMENT DE PRODUITS SUR PALETTE

Publication

EP 1006805 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98941491 A

Priority

  • FR 9801690 W
  • FR 9710874 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2767784A1] The invention concerns a device for sealing a system for regulating the temperature of products located on a palette placed in a tunnel circulating ventilation air. Said device is characterised in that, in the tunnel (5), in order to avoid air leakage around the products located on the palette, the airtightness is produced by means of a tarpaulin cover (1) arranged to adhere the sides and the top of the products by the effect of the ventilation air pressure circulating in the tunnel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23C 9/12; F25D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 13/06 (2006.01); A23C 3/04 (2006.01); A23C 9/12 (2006.01); B65D 81/18 (2006.01); F25D 17/00 (2006.01); F25D 23/00 (2006.01); F25D 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 23/069 (2013.01); B65D 81/18 (2013.01); F25D 17/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911141A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2767784 A1 19990305; FR 2767784 B1 19991029; AT 283636 T 20041215; AU 735564 B2 20010712; AU 8984998 A 19990322; BG 104132 A 20000831; BR 9811364 A 20000822; BR 9811364 B1 20090505; CA 2301753 A1 19990311; CA 2301753 C 20070703; CN 1097434 C 20030101; CN 1268868 A 20001004; CZ 20000575 A3 20010411; CZ 296463 B6 20060315; DE 69827950 D1 20050105; DE 69827950 T2 20051208; EP 1006805 A1 20000614; EP 1006805 B1 20041201; ES 2234148 T3 20050616; HU 0003561 A2 20010228; HU 0003561 A3 20011128; HU 225290 B1 20060928; IL 134745 A 20030917; IL 134745 D0 20010430; JP 2001514020 A 20010911; JP 4051657 B2 20080227; NZ 502960 A 20020328; PL 190307 B1 20051130; PL 338476 A1 20001106; PT 1006805 E 20050429; SK 2452000 A3 20000814; SK 284966 B6 20060302; TR 200000546 T2 20000721; US 6340043 B1 20020122; WO 9911141 A1 19990311

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170519

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160729

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160615

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-10-30 [PGRI PT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Effective date: 20090717

2009-05-29 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090130

2009-02-11 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20090130

2007-05-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2006-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060730

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2234148 T3

2005-06-16 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-18 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20050518

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-04-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-04-20 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400749

2005-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-03-29 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-03-01 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69827950 P 20050105

2004-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-12-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-12-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-12-01 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041201

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000201

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE