Global Patent Index - EP 1006852 A1

EP 1006852 A1 2000-06-14 - LIQUID DISPENSER, ESPECIALLY FOR DISPENSING LIQUID MEDICAMENTS

Title (en)

LIQUID DISPENSER, ESPECIALLY FOR DISPENSING LIQUID MEDICAMENTS

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSSPENDER, INSBESONDERE FLÜSSIGMEDIKAMENTENSPENDER

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR DE LIQUIDE, NOTAMMENT DISTRIBUTEUR DE MEDICAMENT LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1006852 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939629 A

Priority

  • DE 19737749 A
  • EP 9804299 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9911169A1] The invention relates to a liquid dispenser which delivers a dosage drop by drop, especially for liquid medicaments, consisting of a container (2) with an opening at the top thereof which can be sealed by a deformable membrane (3). Exerting gentle pressure on the membrane (3) enables the liquid to exit from the container (2) through a small discharge tube (12) connected to the inner area of said container (2) in a drop by drop manner. The opening of the discharge tube (12) is located on the upper surface of the membrane (3). At the same time an instrument, e.g. forceps holding a wad of cotton, exerts pressure on the membrane (3) and the displaced liquid from the container (2) can be taken up. This can be achieved by means of one-hand operation. According to the invention, the return flow of possibly unused liquid is prohibited. The instrument comes in contact only with the membrane (3) and the delivered liquid located therein. The membrane (3) can be replaced before each new operation so that the high requirements for sufficient hygiene defined in the medical profession are adhered to (Fig. 1). The liquid dispensers (1) can be connected in any number and in varying directions to a type of battery with the aid of a holding part (21) having an opening (22) on the upper surface thereof for accommodating the liquid dispenser (1) and having connection means, e.g. in the form of a groove or spring connector (23, 24), located on the sides thereof.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 5/12; B65D 83/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/12 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/0094 (2013.01); A47K 5/1208 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9911169A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9911169 A1 19990311; DE 19737749 C1 19990624; EP 1006852 A1 20000614; EP 1006852 B1 20011031; US 6267270 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120710

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110729

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-10-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020430

2002-03-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2001-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010522

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000124

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT