Global Patent Index - EP 1006855 A1

EP 1006855 A1 2000-06-14 - SELF-EVACUATING VACUUM CLEANER

Title (en)

SELF-EVACUATING VACUUM CLEANER

Title (de)

SELBSTENTLEERENDER STAUBSAUGER

Title (fr)

ASPIRATEUR A VIDAGE AUTOMATIQUE

Publication

EP 1006855 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98903462 A

Priority

  • US 9800597 W
  • US 78424897 A
  • US 80233397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9831270A1] A vaccum cleaner has an electric motor driving an air impeller (74) for creating suction and a pump (120) which draws liquid material through an inlet tube (310) from the bottom of a tank (32) and expels it from the tank. The vacuum cleaner also includes a mechanical shut-off and override assembly that automatically shuts off the motor if the liquid level in the tank gets too high. The user, however, can mechanically override this automatic shut-off in order to continue pumping liquid out of the tank. A priming apparatus is disposed in the tank in fluid communication with the pump, and a valve (58) is selectively actuable to establish a pressure differential across liquid in the priming apparatus to thereby prime the pump (120).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 7/00 (2006.01); A47L 11/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 7/0028 (2013.01); A47L 7/0038 (2013.01); A47L 7/0042 (2013.01); A47L 11/30 (2013.01); A47L 11/4019 (2013.01); A47L 11/4025 (2013.01); A47L 11/4027 (2013.01); A47L 11/4044 (2013.01); A47L 11/4069 (2013.01); A47L 11/4077 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9831270A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9831270 A1 19980723; AU 6022898 A 19980807; AU 724121 B2 20000914; BR 9806904 A 20000516; CA 2275412 A1 19980723; CA 2275412 C 20050412; CN 1130159 C 20031210; CN 1243422 A 20000202; DE 69805419 D1 20020620; DE 69805419 T2 20030213; EP 1006855 A1 20000614; EP 1006855 B1 20020515; HK 1023709 A1 20040827

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151223

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-05-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030218

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69805419 20020620

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990630

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT