Global Patent Index - EP 1006896 A4

EP 1006896 A4 2002-11-13 - TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR COUPLING ULTRASONIC ENERGY TO A BODY FOR THROMBOLYSIS OF VASCULAR THROMBI

Title (en)

TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR COUPLING ULTRASONIC ENERGY TO A BODY FOR THROMBOLYSIS OF VASCULAR THROMBI

Title (de)

WANDLER-ANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KOPPELN VON ULTRASCHALL-ENERGIE ZUR ABBAU VON BLUTPFROPFEN IN GEFÄSSEN

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE TRANSDUCTEUR ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE COUPLER DE L'ENERGIE ULTRASONORE A UN CORPS DANS LE BUT DE REALISER UNE THROMBOLYSE DE THROMBUS VASCULAIRES

Publication

EP 1006896 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98931690 A

Priority

  • US 9813450 W
  • US 88533897 A
  • US 92218897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9900061A1] A transducer assembly (10) and method for coupling ultrasonic energy to a body (12) for thrombolysis of vascular thrombi is provided. The assembly includes a catalytic transducer (14) for transmitting ultrasound into a medical target transcutaneously. The catalytic transducer includes a front mass (28) having structure which optimizes the transmission of ultrasound into the body. A reservoir (32) for containing a cooling conductive medium (34) between the front mass and the body surface is provided, and is contained within the housing. The front mass (28) includes an apex (78) for accumulating expelled gasses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/22 (2006.01); G10K 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G10K 11/02 (2013.01); A61B 17/2251 (2013.01); A61B 2017/22084 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9900061 A1 19990107; AU 8174198 A 19990119; CA 2301145 A1 19990107; EP 1006896 A1 20000614; EP 1006896 A4 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-11-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TRANSDUCER ASSEMBLY FOR COUPLING ULTRASONIC ENERGY TO A BODY

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040202

2002-11-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021002

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL