Global Patent Index - EP 1006960 A1

EP 1006960 A1 2000-06-14 - COMFORTABLE ORTHOPAEDIC SUPPORT AND THE METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME

Title (en)

COMFORTABLE ORTHOPAEDIC SUPPORT AND THE METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME

Title (de)

KOMFORTABLE ORTHOPÄDISCHE STÜTZE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

SUPPORT ORTHOPEDIQUE CONFORTABLE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 1006960 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97939681 A

Priority

  • US 9715265 W
  • US 70521896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9808470A1] An ankle support (100) is constructed using a molded pad (110) and a rigid shell (112). The pad (110) and the shell (112) may be sealed together to form a bladder-pad cushion for comfort. The internal structure of the pad (110) is molded to include geometrically shaped cells of various size, shape and thickness to provide differing levels of localized comfort to the user of the ankle support (100). The pad may be made from a thermoplastic elastomer (TPE) which is spring-like and resists compression sets. The pad may include integrally-molded fingers extending to the shell. The fingers may have different lengths in one or more regions, in order to increase the cushioning effect in a particular region. The pad/shell combination may form a sealed bladder, and a pneumatic pump may be provided in conjunction with the shell so that the user can inflate the bladder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61F 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 5/01 (2006.01); A61F 5/30 (2006.01); A61F 7/08 (2006.01); A61F 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 5/0111 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9808470 A1 19980305; AU 4171397 A 19980319; AU 739674 B2 20011018; CA 2264656 A1 19980305; CA 2264656 C 20080205; DE 69718214 D1 20030206; DE 69718214 T2 20030904; EP 1006960 A1 20000614; EP 1006960 A4 20001129; EP 1006960 B1 20030102; ES 2189972 T3 20030716; JP 2000517217 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040830

2005-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050829

2005-06-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-04-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-04-20 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040829

2005-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-08-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040830

2004-08-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040829

2004-01-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030930

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030908

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030825

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-08-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030820

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2189972 T3

2003-04-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030402

2003-03-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RITSCHER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69718214 P 20030206

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-11-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61F 5/00 A, 7A 61F 5/34 B

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990329

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE