Global Patent Index - EP 1006999 A2

EP 1006999 A2 2000-06-14 - USE OF SUBMICRON OIL-IN-WATER EMULSIONS WITH DNA VACCINES

Title (en)

USE OF SUBMICRON OIL-IN-WATER EMULSIONS WITH DNA VACCINES

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG VON SUBMIKRON ÖL-IN-WASSER EMULSIONEN MIT DNA IMPFSTOFFEN

Title (fr)

UTILISATION D'EMULSIONS HUILE DANS EAU SUBMICRONIQUES AVEC DES VACCINS A ADN

Publication

EP 1006999 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98933312 A

Priority

  • US 9814310 W
  • US 5194497 P
  • US 5475697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902132A2] The use of submicron oil-in-water emulsions with nucleic acid immunization techniques is disclosed. The method includes immunization with vaccine compositions containing nucleic acid molecules encoding one or more antigens of interest, as well as administration of a submicron oil-in-water adjuvant, such as MF59. The adjuvant can be administered either before, after or simultaneously with the nucleic acid vaccines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/107 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 39/12 (2006.01); A61K 39/21 (2006.01); A61K 39/29 (2006.01); A61K 39/39 (2006.01); A61K 47/44 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/29 (2013.01); A61K 39/12 (2013.01); A61K 39/21 (2013.01); A61K 39/292 (2013.01); A61K 9/1075 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55505 (2013.01); A61K 2039/55566 (2013.01); A61K 2039/572 (2013.01); C12N 2730/10122 (2013.01); C12N 2730/10134 (2013.01); C12N 2740/16134 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902132A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902132 A2 19990121; WO 9902132 A3 19990812; AU 8298298 A 19990208; CA 2295740 A1 19990121; EP 1006999 A2 20000614; JP 2002509545 A 20020326

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030621

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 9/10 A

2003-03-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 37/04 B

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-03-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 9/10 A, 7A 61P 37/04 B

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE