Global Patent Index - EP 1007035 A4

EP 1007035 A4 2000-11-22 - POLYTHIOPHENE ANTI-TUMOR AGENTS

Title (en)

POLYTHIOPHENE ANTI-TUMOR AGENTS

Title (de)

POLYTHIOPHENE ALS ANTITUMORMITTEL

Title (fr)

AGENTS ANTINEOPLASTIQUES A BASE DE POLYTHIOFENE

Publication

EP 1007035 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96945379 A

Priority

US 9619118 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9823269A1] Novel polythiophene compounds useful as anti-tumor agents are described. Preferred compounds of formula (I) wherein n is 0-2 and R2 and R3 are optionally substituted 2-thienyl or 3-thienyl have been found to exhibit selective cytotoxic activity against transformed human cells. Pharmaceutical compositions containing the described polythiophene compounds are expected to exhibit good chemotherapeutic activity against slow growing tumors based on tumor cell line assays. A method for treating patients having tumors utilizing the disclosed polythiophene compounds is also described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/38; C07D 333/14; C07D 333/16; C07D 333/28; C07D 333/30; C07D 333/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/381 (2006.01); A61K 31/7042 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 333/18 (2006.01); C07D 333/20 (2006.01); C07D 333/22 (2006.01); C07D 333/28 (2006.01); C07D 333/32 (2006.01); C07D 333/38 (2006.01); C07H 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 333/38 (2013.01); A61K 31/381 (2013.01); C07D 333/18 (2013.01); C07D 333/22 (2013.01); C07D 333/28 (2013.01); C07D 333/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 5508440 A 19960416 - CHANG CHING-TE [TW], et al
  • [X] US 4937256 A 19900626 - KOBER REINER [DE], et al
  • [X] ASHENDEL C L_(A): "Terthiophenes as novel inhibitors of protein kinase C.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, no. 2661, March 1994 (1994-03-01), XP002147662
  • [X] WATERS D J_(A) T_(A): "In vivo antitumor efficacy of a novel polythiophene against ras-transformed human bronchial epithelial cells.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, no. 2705, March 1996 (1996-03-01), XP002147663
  • [X] ASHENDEL C L_(A): "Structure-activity relationship of alpha-terthiophene series for inhibition of protein kinase C and cytotoxicity.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH ANNUAL MEETING, no. 2604, March 1995 (1995-03-01), XP002147664
  • See also references of WO 9823269A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9823269 A1 19980604; AU 1564797 A 19980622; CA 2272275 A1 19980604; EP 1007035 A1 20000614; EP 1007035 A4 20001122; JP 2001506624 A 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-11-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001006

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990618

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT