Global Patent Index - EP 1007048 A1

EP 1007048 A1 2000-06-14 - IDENTIFICATION OF AGENTS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE

Title (en)

IDENTIFICATION OF AGENTS FOR USE IN THE TREATMENT OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE

Title (de)

IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON MITTELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER ALZHEIMERSCHEN KRANKHEIT

Title (fr)

IDENTIFICATION D'AGENTS UTILES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MALADIE D'ALZHEIMER

Publication

EP 1007048 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98911551 A

Priority

  • US 9804683 W
  • US 81612297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840071A1] The invention relates to the identification of pharmacological agents to be used in the treatment of Alzheimer's disease and related pathological conditions. Methods and compositions for treatment of conditions caused by amyloidosis, A beta -mediated ROS formation, or both, such as Alzheimer's disease, are disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/545; A01N 37/12; A01N 37/18; A01N 43/00; A01N 43/32; A01N 43/38; A01N 43/40; A01N 43/60; A01N 59/08; A61K 38/17; A61K 49/00; A61P 25/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/545 (2006.01); A61K 31/13 (2006.01); A61K 31/198 (2006.01); A61K 31/395 (2006.01); A61K 31/405 (2006.01); A61K 31/444 (2006.01); A61K 31/4745 (2006.01); A61K 38/17 (2006.01); A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C12Q 1/26 (2006.01); G01N 33/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/13 (2013.01); A61K 31/198 (2013.01); A61K 31/395 (2013.01); A61K 31/444 (2013.01); A61K 31/4745 (2013.01); A61K 45/06 (2013.01); C07K 14/4711 (2013.01); C12Q 1/26 (2013.01); G01N 33/6896 (2013.01); G01N 2333/4709 (2013.01); G01N 2800/2821 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840071 A1 19980917; AU 6548498 A 19980929; AU 748768 B2 20020613; CA 2284170 A1 19980917; CA 2284170 C 20081202; EP 1007048 A1 20000614; EP 1007048 A4 20040922; JP 2001514661 A 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090721

2009-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 31/545 20060101AFI20081212BHEP

2009-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61K 38/17 20060101ALI20081212BHEP

2009-01-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A61P 25/28 20060101ALI20081212BHEP

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050421

2005-06-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050421

2004-09-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 31/545 A

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/17 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 49/00 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 37/12 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 37/18 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/00 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/32 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/38 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/40 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 43/60 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 01N 59/08 B

2004-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61P 25/28 B

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991007

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE