Global Patent Index - EP 1007054 A4

EP 1007054 A4 2000-07-19 - LIQUID ALENDRONATE FORMULATIONS

Title (en)

LIQUID ALENDRONATE FORMULATIONS

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGE ALENDRONATZUBEREITUNGEN

Title (fr)

FORMULATIONS LIQUIDES D'ALENDRONATE

Publication

EP 1007054 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97945195 A

Priority

  • GB 9700541 A
  • US 9715740 W
  • US 2676596 P
  • US 3600297 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9814196A1] A liquid formulation of alendronic acid, or pharmaceutically acceptable salt has enough buffer so that the pH of the formulation is 4-7.5, and 15 ml of the formulation is able to raise the pH of 50 ml of 0.1N HC1 from 1 to at least 3, and preferably 4.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 9/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/663 (2006.01); A61K 47/12 (2006.01); A61K 47/26 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 9/0095 (2013.01); A61K 31/663 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9814196 A1 19980409; AU 4644897 A 19980424; AU 723357 B2 20000824; BG 103306 A 20000131; BR 9712197 A 19990831; CA 2267370 A1 19980409; CN 1238691 A 19991215; CZ 9901169 A3 19990915; EA 001213 B1 20001225; EA 199900352 A1 19990826; EE 03669 B1 20020415; EE 9900113 A 19991015; EP 1007054 A1 20000614; EP 1007054 A4 20000719; HU 0000125 A2 20000628; HU 0000125 A3 20010428; IL 129127 D0 20000217; IS 5012 A 19990326; JP 2001501222 A 20010130; NO 991569 A 19990604; NO 991569 D0 19990330; NZ 334836 A 20001124; PL 332496 A1 19990913; SK 42999 A3 20000118; TR 9900730 T2 19990721; YU 17499 A 19991122

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1025043

2003-08-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030203

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020722

2000-08-09 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/66 A, 7A 61K 9/08 B

2000-07-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990504

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19990504;LV PAYMENT 19990504;RO PAYMENT 19990504;SI PAYMENT 19990504