Global Patent Index - EP 1007063 A1

EP 1007063 A1 2000-06-14 - BONE REGENERATION IN OSTEOPOROSIS USING HUMAN BONE MARROW MESENCHYMAL CELLS

Title (en)

BONE REGENERATION IN OSTEOPOROSIS USING HUMAN BONE MARROW MESENCHYMAL CELLS

Title (de)

KNOCHENREGENERATION BEI OSTEOPOROSE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON MESENCHYMZELLEN VON MENSCHLICHEM KNOCHENMARK

Title (fr)

REGENERATION OSSEUSE DANS LE CADRE DE L'OSTEOPOROSE A L'AIDE DE CELLULES MESENCHYMATEUSES DE MOELLE OSSEUSE HUMAINE

Publication

EP 1007063 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98903613 A

Priority

  • US 9801112 W
  • US 3638897 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9832450A1] The method of osteoporosis treatment and infusion compositions of the invention increase the number of the patient's own progenitor cells (hMSCs) and the reservoir of available bone-forming osteoblasts. They can be used to generate cortical and cancellous bone which has been lost as a result of post-menopausal osteoporosis, male idiopathic osteoporosis, congenital osteoporosis and other bone resorption diseases. Most cases of osteoporosis can be treated with a metered intravenous infusion of the composition of the invention over the course of 15-30 minutes, using customary cell reinfusion therapy techniques.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 35/28; C12N 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 35/28 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C12N 5/0775 (2010.01); A61K 35/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12N 5/0663 (2013.01); A61K 2035/124 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9832450 A1 19980730; AU 6033898 A 19980818; CA 2278539 A1 19980730; EP 1007063 A1 20000614; EP 1007063 A4 20020424; EP 2179738 A2 20100428; EP 2179738 A3 20100505; JP 2001509163 A 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-31 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20100128

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030805

2002-04-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSIRIS THERAPEUTICS, INC.

2000-06-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CASE WESTERN RESERVE UNIVERSITY

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990708

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE