Global patent index - EP 1007072 A1

EP 1007072 A1 2000-06-14 - GLIAL CELL LINE-DERIVED NEUROTROPHIC FACTOR RECEPTORS

Title (en)

GLIAL CELL LINE-DERIVED NEUROTROPHIC FACTOR RECEPTORS

Title (de)

REZEPTOREN NEUROTROPHER FAKTOREN AUS EINER GLIA-ZELLINIE

Title (fr)

RECEPTEURS DU FACTEUR NEUROTROPHIQUE DERIVE DE LIGNES DE CELLULES GLIALES

Publication

EP 1007072 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98920199 A

Priority

  • US 9809056 W
  • US 86199097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9852591A1] Receptors for Glial Cell Line-Derived Neurotrophic Factor (GDNF), their cellular expression, isolation, biochemical characterization, and sequences are disclosed. c-RET is disclosed as one receptor for GDNF; additional novel receptors are also disclosed. The preparation of monoclonal antibodies directed against GDNF is also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; A01N 37/18; C07K 1/00; C07K 14/00; C07K 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 19/08 (2006.01); A61P 19/10 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C07K 14/71 (2006.01); C07K 16/28 (2006.01); C12P 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/71 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9852591 A1 19981126; AU 7282598 A 19981211; AU 741208 B2 20011122; CA 2290426 A1 19981126; EP 1007072 A1 20000614; EP 1007072 A4 20020626; JP 2001527418 A 20011225; KR 20010012826 A 20010226; NO 995691 A 20000119; NO 995691 D0 19991119; NZ 501199 A 20011221

INPADOC legal status

2007-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061107

2006-12-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1028356

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2006-07-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040820

2002-06-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020514

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 12N 15/12 A, 7C 07K 14/71 B

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991209

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE