Global Patent Index - EP 1007107 A2

EP 1007107 A2 2000-06-14 - METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING A MOLECULAR SUBSTANCE IN PREDETERMINED AREAS OF EUCARYOTIC CELLS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TRANSPORTING A MOLECULAR SUBSTANCE IN PREDETERMINED AREAS OF EUCARYOTIC CELLS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM TRANSPORT MOLEKULARER SUBSTANZ IN VORGEGEBENE BEREICHE EUKARYONTISCHER ZELLEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR AMENER UNE SUBSTANCE MOLECULAIRE DANS DES ZONES PREDETERMINEES DE CELLULES EUCARYOTES

Publication

EP 1007107 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99939916 A

Priority

  • DE 9901805 W
  • DE 19829005 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829005A1] Production of a vehicle to transport molecular substances inside a eukaryotic cell is new. A method to produce a vehicle to transport molecular substances, such as DNA, RNA, protein, PNA and lipophilic or lipophobic medical materials, in an advantageous region (ZK, ZY, N) inside a eukaryotic cell (Z), where, the molecular substance is coupled, associated or enclosed with a biopolymer; at least one modified viral protein or protein derived from a virus, so that the protein is specific for transport in the advantageous region (ZK, ZY, N); and the modified or derived viral protein is coupled or associated with a biopolymer. An Independent claim is also included for a vehicle to transport molecular substances as above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 51/08; A61K 47/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 47/48 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/025 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/005 (2013.01); A61K 47/48776 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 2710/22022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0000224A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829005 A1 19991230; DE 19829005 C2 20000831; CA 2311119 A1 20000106; EP 1007107 A2 20000614; WO 0000224 A2 20000106; WO 0000224 A3 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030228

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021017

2000-11-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NOVEMBER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT GESELLSCHAFT FUER MOLE

2000-08-09 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-07-28 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI