Global Patent Index - EP 1007157 A1

EP 1007157 A1 2000-06-14 - VALVE UNIT OF A TOTALLY PROTECTIVE CLOTHING

Title (en)

VALVE UNIT OF A TOTALLY PROTECTIVE CLOTHING

Title (de)

VENTILEINHEIT FÜR INTEGRAL-SCHUTZKLEIDUNG

Title (fr)

UNITE DE VALVE POUR VETEMENT DE PROTECTION INTEGRALE

Publication

EP 1007157 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99918421 A

Priority

  • SE 9900585 W
  • SE 9801296 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9955424A1] The invention relates to a valve unit (3) for compressed air ventilated protective clothing (1) with connecting breathing mask/breathing valve (10) for the carrier, with feeding of external as well as internal air, when appropriate, at 7.5 bars pressure. The invention proposes a valve spindle housing (25), arranged in a valve housing (13), said valve spindle housing contains a hollow seat abutting spindle (28) that takes different wide openings of the seats S1, S2, S3 depending upon an exterior manually adjustable cam knob (19), which by means of its cam profile (20) adjusts the spindle in defined, distinct positions L0, L2, L30, L150/L100, according to the choice of the carrier of the clothing, at the same time the carrier is ensured breathing air externally or internally in relation to the clothing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/02 (2006.01); A62B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 9/02 (2013.01); A62B 17/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9955424A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9955424 A1 19991104; DE 69922324 D1 20050105; DE 69922324 T2 20051124; EP 1007157 A1 20000614; EP 1007157 B1 20041201; SE 511868 C2 19991206; SE 9801296 D0 19980415; SE 9801296 L 19991016

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SPIROMEC A.B.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20110430

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69922324

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100426

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100428

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050902

2005-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69922324

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-05

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2000-11-08 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE DE

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE