Global Patent Index - EP 1007186 A2

EP 1007186 A2 2000-06-14 - FILTER ELEMENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR FILTERING LIQUIDS

Title (en)

FILTER ELEMENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR FILTERING LIQUIDS

Title (de)

FILTERELEMENT, INSBESONDERE ZUR FLÜSSIGKEITSFILTERUNG

Title (fr)

ELEMENT FILTRANT, NOTAMMENT POUR LA FILTRATION DE LIQUIDES

Publication

EP 1007186 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98943849 A

Priority

  • DE 19735993 A
  • EP 9804884 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19735993A1] The filter element comprises a non-woven material containing metal and/or glass fibers. A zigzag folded strip is made from panels or rolled sheet. Individual surfaces are defined by pre-stamping (3, 4, 5, 6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01D 29/11 (2006.01); B01D 39/16 (2006.01); B01D 39/20 (2006.01); B01D 46/52 (2006.01); F02M 37/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/22 (2013.01); B01D 29/111 (2013.01); B01D 39/1623 (2013.01); B01D 39/2017 (2013.01); B01D 39/2041 (2013.01); B01D 2201/127 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B01D 29/111 + B01D 29/21

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9908771A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19735993 A1 19990225; EP 1007186 A2 20000614; WO 9908771 A2 19990225; WO 9908771 A3 19990514; ZA 9807505 B 19990517

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050225

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041014

2003-12-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANN + HUMMEL GMBH

2000-08-23 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE