Global Patent Index - EP 1007231 A1

EP 1007231 A1 2000-06-14 - A DEVICE FOR AND A METHOD OF TREATING THE INNER SURFACE OF A CONTAINER

Title (en)

A DEVICE FOR AND A METHOD OF TREATING THE INNER SURFACE OF A CONTAINER

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER INNEREN OBERFLÄCHE EINES BEHÄLTERS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE LA SURFACE INTERIEURE D'UN RECIPIENT

Publication

EP 1007231 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98909942 A

Priority

  • SE 9800453 W
  • SE 9700913 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840175A1] The invention refers to a device and a method for the treatment of the inner surface of a container (2) having an opening. The device comprises a treatment member which is mountable in such a position that it extends into the container (2) through said opening and which is arranged to enable said treatment by the supply of a fluid. Furthermore, the device comprises a cover (1) arranged to close said opening and support the treatment member in said position and having a sealing surface abutting a sealing surface of the container. The cover (1) comprises a drainage passage for fluid consumed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/093

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/08 (2006.01); B08B 9/093 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/0813 (2013.01); B08B 9/0936 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840175A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840175 A1 19980917; AT 254514 T 20031215; AU 6429998 A 19980929; DE 69819908 D1 20031224; DE 69819908 T2 20040902; EP 1007231 A1 20000614; EP 1007231 B1 20031119; NO 308344 B1 20000904; NO 994417 A 19991103; NO 994417 D0 19990910; SE 511222 C2 19990830; SE 9700913 D0 19970313; SE 9700913 L 19980914

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080313

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080313

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-03-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-03-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060328

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040820

2004-09-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2004-03-15 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040315

2004-02-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040219

2004-01-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-12-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69819908 P 20031224

2003-11-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL

2003-11-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-11-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2003-11-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031119

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990908

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IE IT LI NL