Global Patent Index - EP 1007280 A1

EP 1007280 A1 2000-06-14 - A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CUTTING THE EDGE OF A MOVING PAPER WEB

Title (en)

A METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CUTTING THE EDGE OF A MOVING PAPER WEB

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN DES RANDBEREICHS EINER BEWEGENDEN PAPIERBAHN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DECOUPAGE DU BORD D'UNE BANDE DE PAPIER EN DEFILEMENT

Publication

EP 1007280 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 95931239 A

Priority

  • FI 9500523 W
  • FI 941505 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9711814A1] A method for longitudinal cutoff of edge (2) of moving paper web (1), where cutting is carried out by a water jet through the web. In the cutting point (14), vicinity forces are generated in the web (1) in the direction of the web cutting top in order to pull the web forward and towards the edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24C 3/18; B26D 3/12; B65H 20/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24C 3/18 (2006.01); B26D 3/12 (2006.01); B26D 7/18 (2006.01); B26D 7/20 (2006.01); B26F 3/00 (2006.01); B65H 20/14 (2006.01); B65H 23/24 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01); D21F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 7/006 (2013.01); B26D 7/1854 (2013.01); B26D 7/20 (2013.01); B26F 3/004 (2013.01); B65H 23/24 (2013.01); B65H 35/02 (2013.01); B26D 2007/0068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9711814A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711814 A1 19970403; EP 1007280 A1 20000614; EP 1007280 B1 20021211; FI 941505 A0 19940331; FI 941505 A 19951001; FI 98346 B 19970228; FI 98346 C 19970610

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070926

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2008-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080531

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070926

2008-06-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070926

2008-05-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070927

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-11-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061128

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-10-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061002

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060928

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030912

2003-08-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-01-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69529181

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-01-23

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE

2002-12-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-12-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 229405

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010523

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980423

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB SE