Global Patent Index - EP 1007297 A1

EP 1007297 A1 2000-06-14 - SAFETY RAZORS

Title (en)

SAFETY RAZORS

Title (de)

SICHERHEITSRASIERER

Title (fr)

RASOIRS DE SURETE

Publication

EP 1007297 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98905052 A

Priority

  • GB 9703293 A
  • US 9802675 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9835795A1] A safety razor blade unit having a plurality of blades (4) presenting substantially parallel blade edges. The blades are disposed between a guard and a cap. The blades are independently movable and are carried by supports (5). At least one of the supports has spaced portions (12) projecting forwardly of the associated blade to present skin contacting portions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 21/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 21/227 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9835795A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9835795 A1 19980820; AR 011824 A1 20000913; AT 222842 T 20020915; AU 6276498 A 19980908; AU 724961 B2 20001005; BR 9807229 A 20000425; CA 2278806 A1 19980820; CA 2278806 C 20041102; CN 1080169 C 20020306; CN 1248194 A 20000322; CO 4761086 A1 19990427; CZ 293915 B6 20040818; CZ 9902686 A3 20000315; DE 69807495 D1 20021002; DE 69807495 T2 20030424; EP 1007297 A1 20000614; EP 1007297 B1 20020828; ES 2182269 T3 20030301; GB 9703293 D0 19970409; HK 1025071 A1 20030124; HU 0002011 A2 20001028; HU 0002011 A3 20011128; HU 223834 B1 20050228; ID 22918 A 19991216; IL 131187 A 20040725; IL 131187 D0 20010128; JP 2001511682 A 20010814; JP 4201842 B2 20081224; KR 100539658 B1 20051229; NO 322846 B1 20061211; NO 993918 A 19990813; NO 993918 D0 19990813; NZ 337014 A 20010223; PL 186889 B1 20040331; PL 335080 A1 20000410; PT 1007297 E 20030131; RO 120325 B1 20051230; RU 2181324 C2 20020420; SK 103399 A3 20000516; SK 285265 B6 20061005; TR 9901981 T2 19991221; YU 38899 A 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-28 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: THE GILLETTE COMPANY LLC (N. D. GES. D. STAATE, US

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THE GILLETTE CO., BOSTON, MASS., US

- Document: DE 69807495

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-11-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121031

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100214

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100214

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110322

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110201

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-04-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100213

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100901

2011-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100813

2010-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100213

2010-10-05 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-09-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100901

2010-08-23 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20100813

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090206

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090126

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090210

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-05-29 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20090106

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2182269 T3

2003-02-13 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030213

2003-01-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021122

2002-11-28 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69807495 20021002

2002-08-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-08-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 222842 T 20020915

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000929

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE