Global Patent Index - EP 1007302 A1

EP 1007302 A1 2000-06-14 - A MACHINE FOR REDUCING ROOTS OF LOGS

Title (en)

A MACHINE FOR REDUCING ROOTS OF LOGS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM REDUZIEREN DER WURZELENDEN VON BAUMSTÄMMEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE DESTINEE A COUPER LES RACINES DE RONDINS DE BOIS

Publication

EP 1007302 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98921970 A

Priority

  • SE 9800820 W
  • SE 9701690 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9850206A1] A machine for root reduction of logs comprising a framework (1), a support device (2) arranged on the framework, logs being placeable on the support device in a position with a root end portion of the log (7) in question protruding freely from the support device, and a cutter (3) for processing the root end portion of the log protruding from the support device. The support device (2) comprises means (4) for causing the log to rotate while the root end portion is being processed. The support device (2) and the rotation means (4) form a unit (5), which is movably connected to the framework, and this unit is operable, by means of a power exerting arrangement (6), between different positions wherein a log supported on the support device (2) is located on different levels in the machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27C 5/08; B27L 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27C 5/08 (2006.01); B27C 7/00 (2006.01); B27L 1/00 (2006.01); B27L 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27C 5/08 (2013.01); B27C 7/005 (2013.01); B27L 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9850206A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9850206 A1 19981112; AT 252968 T 20031115; AU 7461198 A 19981127; CZ 298237 B6 20070801; CZ 9903924 A3 20000614; DE 69819339 D1 20031204; DE 69819339 T2 20040812; EE 04008 B1 20030415; EE 9900473 A 20000615; EP 1007302 A1 20000614; EP 1007302 B1 20031029; ES 2210755 T3 20040701; NO 312820 B1 20020708; NO 995410 A 19991104; NO 995410 D0 19991104; PL 186834 B1 20040331; PL 336637 A1 20000703; SE 513907 C2 20001127; SE 9701690 D0 19970505; SE 9701690 L 19981106

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170518

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170516

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170518

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170517

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140506

2015-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150626

2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140602

2015-02-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150130

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BRUKS HOLDING AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CONSAFE INDUSTRY AB, ARBRA, SE

- Document: DE 69819339

- Effective date: 20120329

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69819339

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI LIERMANN-CASTELL, PATENTA, DE

- Effective date: 20120329

2012-05-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69819339

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI LIERMANN-CASTELL, DE

- Effective date: 20120329

2011-11-14 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BRUKS HOLDING AB

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-09-30 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BRUKS HOLDING AB, SE

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-09-30 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BRUKS HOLDING AB, SE

- Effective date: 20110826

2011-06-30 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BRUKS HOLDING AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BRUKS HOLDING AB, ARBRA, SE

- Document: DE 69819339

- Effective date: 20110428

2011-05-11 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110414 AND 20110420

2011-03-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BKH MILJO AB

- Effective date: 20110304

2011-03-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BKH MILJO AB

- Effective date: 20110303

2010-01-01 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-01-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-01-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-10-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20090917 AND 20090923

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2005-02-09 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2210755 T3

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-05-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040505

2004-01-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69819339 P 20031204

2003-11-26 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI PT SE

2003-10-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031029

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020703

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IE IT LI PT SE