Global patent index - EP 1007306 A1

EP 1007306 A1 2000-06-14 - A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A CURVED WOODEN FIBRE PLATE AND A WOODEN FIBRE PLATE MANUFACTURED HEREBY

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF A CURVED WOODEN FIBRE PLATE AND A WOODEN FIBRE PLATE MANUFACTURED HEREBY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN VON GEBOGEN HOLZFASERPLATTEN UND HERGESTELLTE HOLZFASERPLATTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PLAQUE EN FIBRE DE BOIS INCURVEE ET PLAQUE EN FIBRE DE BOIS AINSI PRODUITE

Publication

EP 1007306 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 97912080 A

Priority

  • DK 9700535 W
  • DK 134096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9823422A1] In the production of furniture, including loudspeaker cabinets, it is desirable to be able to manufacture curved furniture panels in a profitable manner. Accordingly, the invention provides a method for the manufacture of a curved board, preferably a wood fibre board coated with veneer at least on the front side, from at least a substantially plane board, whose front side in the plane state is given a basic surface finishing, and, before or after or in connection with the surface finishing, the rear side of the board in its plane state, at least the part of the board to be curved, is formed with parallel groove-shaped slits in the longitudinal direction of the desired curvature, following which the board is bent in the transverse direction to a concave or convex cross-sectional shape, and that the board is then fixed in this curved configuration. This provides a method which allows furniture boards for curved furniture boards to be manufactured with the same quality as plane panels and on the same process equipment, thereby considerably reducing the production costs for the manufacture of curved furniture panels. The invention moreover provides a furniture board for use in the method, a furniture panel and an article of furniture manufactured by the performance of a method according to the invention.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 7/00; D21J 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/20 (2006.01); B27H 1/00 (2006.01); B27N 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 96/202 (2013.01); A47B 96/205 (2013.01); B27H 1/00 (2013.01); B27N 7/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9823422A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9823422 A1 19980604; AU 4941897 A 19980622; DE 69711097 D1 20020418; DE 69711097 T2 20021128; DK 134096 A 19980302; DK 172290 B1 19980302; EP 1007306 A1 20000614; EP 1007306 B1 20020313

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131121

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131202

2014-09-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69711097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131121

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140731

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20131121

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121010

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20121114

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-05-03 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27O

- Effective date: 20051211

2003-01-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: JAMO A/S

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-08-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69711097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE

2002-03-13 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-03-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: THOMSEN, JORGEN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990515

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT SE