Global patent index - EP 1007345 A1

EP 1007345 A1 2000-06-14 - IDENTIFICATION CARD STRIP ASSEMBLY

Title (en)

IDENTIFICATION CARD STRIP ASSEMBLY

Title (de)

IDENTIFIZIERUNGSKARTE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE BANDE DE CARTE D'IDENTIFICATION

Publication

EP 1007345 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98923773 A

Priority

  • US 9810686 W
  • US 86693997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9853984A1] An identification card strip assembly (20) including a support strip (22) having thereon at least one, and preferably a plurality of identification card blanks (24) removably and adhesively adhered to the support strip (22). Each identification card blank (24) has a front printing surface (26) for printing indicia (28) thereon and a rear adhesive surface (30) having an adhesive (32) thereon. The rear adhesive surface (30) is removably and adhesively adhered to the support strip (22). The card blank (24) includes a first sheet (34) and a second sheet (36) foldably connected to each other along a fold line (38). Each sheet (34, 36) has at least one substantially identically shaped aperture (40) therein. Each of the sheets (34, 36) is of a size and shape and the aperture (40) is located in each sheet (34, 36) so that when the card blank (24) is removed from the support strip (22) and the sheets (34, 36) are folded along the fold line (40) upon each other with the adhesive surfaces (30) joined to each other, the first sheet (34) and the second sheet (36) are substantially superposed upon each other and substantially coextensive with each other and the apertures (40) in each sheet (34, 36) overlay each other to form a mounting means for mounting the card (24) on an object.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/00; B32B 3/10; B42D 15/04; B42D 15/10; B65D 65/28; B65D 65/30; G09F 3/00; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2006.01); G09F 3/12 (2006.01); G09F 3/14 (2006.01); G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/12 (2013.01); G09F 3/10 (2013.01); G09F 3/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9853984 A1 19981203; AU 749862 B2 20020704; AU 7598898 A 19981230; CA 2291023 A1 19981203; DE 69822477 D1 20040422; DE 69822477 T2 20050120; EP 1007345 A1 20000614; EP 1007345 A4 20000906; EP 1007345 B1 20040317; ES 2217557 T3 20041101

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070527

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060527

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRADY WORLDWIDE INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20060531

2007-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060529

2007-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070131

2007-02-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20061201

2007-01-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060527

2007-01-16 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-12-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061201

2006-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060531

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060529

2006-05-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060528

2006-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060527

2005-07-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050714

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050624

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-27 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050511

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050503

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2217557

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2004-06-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: BRADY WORLDWIDE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69822477

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BRADY WORLDWIDE, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2000-09-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2000-09-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 31F 1/00 A, 7B 32B 3/10 B, 7B 42D 15/04 B, 7B 42D 15/10 B, 7B 65D 65/28 B, 7B 65D 65/30 B, 7G 09F 3/00 B, 7G 09F 3/10 B, 7B 42D 5/02 B

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991227

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE