Global Patent Index - EP 1007361 A1

EP 1007361 A1 2000-06-14 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY LOADING PROCESSING STATIONS WITH PRINTING CYLINDERS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATICALLY LOADING PROCESSING STATIONS WITH PRINTING CYLINDERS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN BESCHICKEN VON BEARBEITUNGSSTATIONEN MIT DRUCKZYLINDERN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT LE CHARGEMENT AUTOMATIQUE DE CYLINDRES D'IMPRESSION DANS DES STATIONS DE TRAITEMENT

Publication

EP 1007361 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98932078 A

Priority

  • DE 19736698 A
  • EP 9803054 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736698A1] The device has several loading stations (2). These serve for bringing the printing cylinders into the device, as a storage place for the printing cylinders before and after processing, and as an issuing point for issuing the printing cylinders from the device after processing. A crane (3) can be used to move the cylinder or processing station.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 9/18; B66C 1/28; B66C 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/18 (2006.01); B66C 1/28 (2006.01); B66C 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/18 (2013.01); Y10S 414/122 (2013.01); Y10S 414/123 (2013.01); Y10S 414/124 (2013.01); Y10T 483/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9910175A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736698 A1 19990225; DE 19736698 C2 20010913; AT 214663 T 20020415; EP 1007361 A1 20000614; EP 1007361 B1 20020320; JP 2001514097 A 20010911; JP 3335165 B2 20021015; US 6692210 B1 20040217; WO 9910175 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2013-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-05-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803452 20020425

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2002-03-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214663 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000113

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL