Global Patent Index - EP 1007363 A1

EP 1007363 A1 2000-06-14 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SPRAYING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE LIQUID

Title (en)

CONTROL SYSTEM FOR SPRAYING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE LIQUID

Title (de)

SYSTEM ZUM STEUERN DES AUSSTOSSENS VON ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGER FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE PROJECTION DE LIQUIDE ELECTRIQUEMENT CONDUCTEUR

Publication

EP 1007363 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98928414 A

Priority

  • FR 9801107 W
  • FR 9706799 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2763870A1] The invention concerns a control system for spraying an electrically conductive liquid (3) emitted in the form of a pressure jet (4) by means of a nozzle (2), comprising means for fractionating the liquid jet into droplets, means for electrically charging said droplets and means for applying a deflecting electric field to the charged droplets. The system comprises: a first (8) and a second (6) monolithic element each having a continuous surface, arranged such that the continuous surfaces are facing each other and define between them a space (5) wherein the pressure jet (4) is emitted by said nozzle (2), said elements (6, 8) including means for constantly providing voltages to said continuous surfaces to obtain said current load of the droplets and said deflecting electric field; electronic means (31 to 36) controlling said voltages and controlling the intensity of the electric currents circulating on said continuous surfaces.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/06 (2006.01); B41J 2/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9855315A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2763870 A1 19981204; FR 2763870 B1 19990820; AU 741223 B2 20011129; AU 8024898 A 19981221; CA 2292641 A1 19981210; CN 1095752 C 20021211; CN 1265624 A 20000906; DE 69808104 D1 20021024; DE 69808104 T2 20030515; EP 1007363 A1 20000614; EP 1007363 B1 20020918; ES 2184279 T3 20030401; JP 2002502332 A 20020122; US 6511164 B1 20030128; WO 9855315 A1 19981210

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040603

2005-06-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-06-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050101

2004-06-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040602

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-06-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030627

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-05-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184279 T3

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69808104 20021024

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991122

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL SE