Global Patent Index - EP 1007380 A1

EP 1007380 A1 2000-06-14 - MOTOR VEHICLE AIR CONDITIONING CIRCUIT PROVIDED WITH A PRE-EXPANSION DEVICE

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE AIR CONDITIONING CIRCUIT PROVIDED WITH A PRE-EXPANSION DEVICE

Title (de)

KLIMAKREISLAUF EINES FAHRZEUGES MIT EINER VOREXPANSIONSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE CLIMATISATION DE VEHICULE MUNI D'UN DISPOSITIF DE PREDETENTE

Publication

EP 1007380 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99957155 A

Priority

  • FR 9901514 W
  • FR 9807929 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779994A1] The system comprises compressor (2), condenser (3), liquid/gas separating reservoir (5), an expansion device (6) and evaporator (7). The pre-expansion device (4) is inserted between condenser and reservoir to provide a pressure drop in the range 1.5 to 14 bars, reducing the fluid to its vapor saturated pressure. The device (4) may be positioned in the condenser outlet (13 in fig 5) and can take the form of an aperture (S2 in fig 6) with cross sectional area of 0.2 to 7 mm2 over a length of 0.1 to 5mm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/32 (2006.01); F25B 41/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 41/06 (2013.01); B60H 1/3205 (2013.01); B60H 1/3211 (2013.01); B60H 1/3227 (2013.01); B60H 2001/3242 (2013.01); B60H 2001/3251 (2013.01); B60H 2001/3279 (2013.01); B60H 2001/3285 (2013.01); B60H 2001/3297 (2013.01); F25B 2339/0441 (2013.01); F25B 2339/0445 (2013.01); F25B 2500/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779994 A1 19991224; FR 2779994 B1 20000811; EP 1007380 A1 20000614; JP 2003513836 A 20030415; US 6425262 B1 20020730; WO 9967101 A2 19991229; WO 9967101 A3 20021003

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050621

2002-12-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 60H 1/32 A, 7F 25B 41/06 B

2002-11-20 [D17D] SEARCH REPORT (DELETED)

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000717

2000-06-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000320

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB